NEXUS CCS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We use a cafe environment to allow people to engage in a non-threatening way in order to The development of contemporary Christian spirituality through film, mediation and discussion. The development of creativity and art through exhibitions, workshops, discussion. We are exploring ways in which we can develop a sense of community within a busy city centre context.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 02 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Hester Lorraine Parr | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Caroline Wickens | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev David John Sharples | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
VICTOR JAMES DANIEL FLETCHER | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Graham Renaid Kent | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Roger Kenneth Newton | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.76k | £35.58k | £1.78k | £304 | £77 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.04k | £39.20k | £9.66k | £3.14k | £1.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2023 | 324 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN MANCHESTER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PERSONAL GROWTH THROUGH CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALITY, CREATING CULTURALLY RELEVANT SPACES IN WHICH TO GATHER AND THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE. (2) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE VISUAL ARTS AND CRAFTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE VISUAL ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ARRANGING AND HOLDING EXHIBITIONS OF ARTISTS WORK. (3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE DIRECTORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nexus Art Cafe
Central Buildings
Oldham Street
MANCHESTER
M1 1JQ
- Phone:
- 0161 2360100
- Email:
- abigail@nexusartcafe.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window