THE ARK CAT RESCUE (BUCKINGHAMSHIRE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our work involves taking in unwanted and stray cats and kittens and finding them appropriate, permanent homes. Cats/Kittens are provided with any treatment/ rehabilitation necessary, chipped and spay/neutered. We also provide assistance and education regarding cat welfare. We will assist with trapping and spay/neutering of feral or stray animals, or suggest other sources of help as appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 17 March 2011: Standard registration
- 09 October 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 15 September 2013 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS AND KITTENS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE,PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY TO CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY MEANS OF POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, HOMELESSNESS OR MALTREATMENT. TO FURTHER SEEK TO FIND APPROPRIATE AND PERMANENT ADOPTIVE FAMILIES FOR ALL STRAY, UNWANTED OR HOMELESS CATS AND KITTENS CARED FOR UNDER THE AUSSPICES OF THE ARK CAT RESCUE. TO FURTHER PROVIDE EDUCATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE AND PREVENTION OF SUFFERING AMONG CATS AND KITTENS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window