TRAUMA RECOVERY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trauma Recovery Centre (TRC) exists to facilitate the creative and purposeful recovery of children facing challenge and crisis. The charity provides therapy and counselling to children and their carers who are facing trauma and extreme challenges; and training in the recovery from trauma and abuse to charities and organisations working with children and adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,600 from 28 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Oxfordshire
- Wiltshire
- Guernsey
Governance
- 03 May 2011: Standard registration
- TRC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth de Thierry | Chair | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Tracy Bassett | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Carolyn Aruparayil | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS MARY PATTERSON | Trustee | 30 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.34k | £198.72k | £104.11k | £159.22k | £283.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.73k | £161.15k | £154.53k | £146.48k | £210.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £21.58k | £23.46k | £33.22k | £62.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.90k | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/01/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/12/2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SUFFERING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CRISIS OR TRAUMA WHICH HAS CAUSED EMOTIONAL DAMAGE BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF TRAUMA RECOVERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trauma Recovery Centre
John Eccles House
Science Park
Robert Robinson Avenue
Littlemore
Oxford
- Phone:
- 07947 117714
- Email:
- admin@trc-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window