JELLYBABIES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jellybabies Nursery provides quality and affordable childcare in the Failsworth area. We can cater for 48 children from birth to five years old. The nursery follows the EYFS cirriculumn in a safe, loving and fun environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Tameside
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
- JELLYBABIES NURSERY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Smith | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jones | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOBSON | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.33k | £323.31k | £350.92k | £390.74k | £437.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.56k | £323.69k | £356.32k | £389.65k | £425.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £32.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £115.51k | £32.60k | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/12/2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR HE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jellybabies Nursery
Main Street
Failsworth
MANCHESTER
M35 9PD
- Phone:
- 01616372858
- Email:
- info@jellybabiesnursery.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window