SPRINGFIELD, MOTOR RACING'S CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Springfield, Motor Racing's Club For Young People ("Springfield") provides a variety of activities for young people living in Hackney in East London. Activities include football, cycling and sailing with additional activities being added all the time. Springfield has a excellent facilities including a gymnasium and IT centre at its premises in Hackney.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 18 March 2011: Standard registration
- 14 January 2013: Funds received from 303026 SPRINGFIELD, MOTOR RACING'S CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Keogh | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicia Barrow | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAID HERSI | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEVE HERBERT | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RAMON KEOGH | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £36.89k | £38.93k | £11.97k | £16.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.59k | £33.45k | £23.16k | £39.82k | £58.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £27.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/03/2011
Charitable objects
BY PROVIDING LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO PROMOTE THEIR PERSONAL AND SOCIAL EDUCATION SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Anthony Marsh Building
Big Hill
Upper Clapton
London
E5 9HH
- Phone:
- 02088061168
- Email:
- nigel@springfieldclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window