Accounts and annual returns THE AUTSCAPE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1141913
Charity reporting is up to date (157 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 January 2025 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 03 January 2025 157 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 January 2025 523 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 03 January 2025 523 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window