SPILLS HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to other charitable bodies, primarily education, heritage and medical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Antigua And Barbuda
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JOHN MORTON EVANS | Chair | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK ADAM KALDERON | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA LOUISE FLOWER | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/04/2020 | 15/04/2021 | 15/04/2022 | 15/04/2023 | 15/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.33k | £48.30k | £69.16k | £55.60k | £38.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.81k | £43.66k | £58.80k | £40.71k | £25.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PAYMENT OF GRANTS,LOANS AND OTHER PAYMENTS TO SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spills Hill Farm
Chickenden Lane
Staplehurst
Tonbridge
TN12 0DP
- Phone:
- 07710553038
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window