THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTLE

Charity Number: 1141300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through activities for all members of society. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups and school assemblies. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £190,594
Total expenditure: £160,720

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 April 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S BATTLE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Very Reverend Lee Christopher James Duckett Chair 26 September 2019
None on record
Jonathan Andrew Snow Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Sandra Walker Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Tracy Ann Dixon Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Tracy Dixon Trustee 11 May 2022
BATTLE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Received: On time
Jacqueline Richards Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Virginia Selmon Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Carolyn Collins Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Rowan Smith Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
John Roberts Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Paul Lewis Trustee 30 September 2020
CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time
THE BATTLE CHARITIES
Received: On time
Phillip Collins Trustee 30 September 2020
THE BATTLE CHARITIES
Received: On time
JULIA ELIZABETH THORP Mrs Trustee 15 March 2011
None on record
ALISON JUDITH HASSELL Trustee 15 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £130.61k £95.06k £145.28k £210.73k £190.59k
Total expenditure £147.72k £98.39k £117.68k £147.21k £160.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £16.91k £366 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys The Virgin Church
Upper Lake
BATTLE
East Sussex
TN33 0AN
Phone:
01424775290