ASPECT FOUNDATION FOR MUSIC AND ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of educational and entertaining classical music events, providing free tickets to music schools and colleges; as well as organisation of free events for cultural institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 May 2011: Standard registration
- ASPECT (Working name)
- Aspect chamber music series (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRINA KNASTER | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SEBASTIAN LENNOX JOHNSTON | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
FELIX FRIEDMAN | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.83k | £0 | £188.70k | £187.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12 | £1.00k | £52.59k | £327.91k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: - THE ADVANCEMENT OF, AND EDUCATION IN, THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE AND, IN PARTICULAR, MUSIC AND THE VISUAL ARTS; AND - THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PRUPSOES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 PARK LANE (4TH FLOOR)
LONDON
W1K 1RA
- Phone:
- 02073611715
- Email:
- info@aspectmusic.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window