AL-KHAYR ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Islamic religion by promoting the study of religious teaching and practices and scriptures. To help young muslims so as to develop their mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow and reach their full potential and contribute positively to society both as individuals and as a memberof their faith group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 July 2011: Standard registration
- MADRASAH RAWDHATUS SALIHAAT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Hamid Palejwala | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
FARUQUE VALI | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUBARAK DAUD ALI MANYA | Trustee | 13 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.16k | £62.54k | £93.68k | £112.74k | £348.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.73k | £27.43k | £64.00k | £84.87k | £168.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 27 June 2022 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/03/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF RELIGIOUS TEACHING AND PRACTIES AND SCRIPTURES. 2.TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG MUSLIMS SO AS TO DEVELOPE THEIR MENTAL & SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW AND REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL & CONTRIBUTE POSITIVELY TO SOCIETY BOTH AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBER OF THEIR FAITH GROUP. 3.TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE CHARITABLE SERVICES AS AGREED BY TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GARFIELD GROVE
BOLTON
BL3 5AY
- Phone:
- 07984 6717432
- Email:
- mmanya@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window