NEWSTEAD ENTERPRISE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newstead Enterprise carries out urban & rural regeneration in particular in Newstead and surrounding area. Activities include education & training in land management particularly for young people; the development of a Visitor Centre and fishing lakes; the conservation, protection and improvement of the local environment; all using the Newstead & Annesley Country Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 25 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dean Gladwin | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY DAY | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEIVERS | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £9.34k | £2.58k | £6.79k | £14.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £9.77k | £2.98k | £6.79k | £15.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 403 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 421 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/02/2011
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND IN PARTICULAR IN NEWSTEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THAT WAS KNOWN AS THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE COALFIELD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (C) THE MAINTENANCE OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; (E) THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND (F) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAST ANGLING PROJECT
Cornerstone House
Tilford Road
Newstead Village
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 0BU
- Phone:
- 01623723431
- Email:
- mick@castap.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window