BRIGHT SPARKS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bright Sparks runs an after-school programme for disadvantaged children and young people who are gifted and talented. Hands-on, exciting enrichment classes and fun activities offer children the chance to stretch their minds and explore new topics whilst developing friendships with other local children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 14 November 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 April 2014 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/10/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN HACKNEY AND HARINGEY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HACKNEY OR HARINGEY BY MAKING FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window