ALRIDHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to benefit different sectors of society by providing education, guidance, social and financial support to women, children, young adults and the general community. This is done within local communities by engaging the youth in projects to promote understanding and coexistence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Iraq
- United States
Governance
- 11 July 2011: Standard registration
- ALSALAM FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FADHIL MEHDI | Chair | 15 March 2011 |
|
|||||
Batoul Imad Bachir | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hadia Saad | Trustee | 03 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amir Mehdi | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.73k | £162.83k | £178.73k | £211.61k | £215.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £534.75k | £338.21k | £188.43k | £222.12k | £217.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.69k | N/A | £6.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 27TH JUNE 2011) 1 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF BELIEFS BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS AND RACIAL GROUPS. 2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HELP IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN. 3 FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDING WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Grand Parade
Forty Avenue
London
HA9 9JS
- Phone:
- 02084506608
- Email:
- info@alridha.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window