SHEFFIELD ACADEMY OF YOUNG LEADERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide information, training and support for young people to engage in planned leadership and volunteering activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 September 2011: Standard registration
- 20 February 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SAYLS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 29 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 31 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF, AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY (WITHOUT LIMITATION) IN AND AROUND THE AREA OF THE AREA COVERED BY SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, EDUCATION, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AND WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITIES AS INDEPENDANT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND CITIZENS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 12-25 WHO ARE OR WHO WISH TO BE IN POSITIONS OF LEADERSHIP TO LEARN ABOUT AND DEVELOP LEADERSHIP SKILLS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window