Financial history DARJEELING CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity Number: 1143109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.11k £83.66k £92.43k £184.35k £98.90k
Total expenditure £105.21k £60.02k £45.40k £148.86k £167.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A