Trustees DARJEELING CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1143109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr GRAHAM MICHAEL CORY Chair 06 January 2024
None on record
Dr Jennifer Ann Owen Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Matthew Alec Emile Morpurgo Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Matthew Houghton Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Tshering Huber Trustee 12 January 2020
None on record
MAJOR PASANG WANGDI Trustee 27 July 2011
None on record
SHARAN PATEL Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record
HUGH HERON Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record