Financial history HOPSCOTCH CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £27.02k £25.00k £28.58k £49.10k £48.98k
Total expenditure £26.75k £25.32k £28.43k £48.49k £49.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A