Accounts and annual returns THAMES TURBO TRIATHLON CLUB

Charity number: 1144151
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2012 06 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 06 June 2013 On Time