Trustees KERALA ARTS AND LITERARY ASSOCIATION (KALA)
Charity Number: 1144122

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manoj Nambiar | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hema Santhosh Dr. | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ajay Chandran | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vaniya Nanu Kandiyil Dr. | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nisha Ramkumar | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Govindan Vishnu Nampoothiri | Trustee | 04 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shankar Meembat | Trustee | 04 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vipin Selvaraj Playikovilakam Venkitachalam | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Padmanabha Pillai Sreeram | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kurupath Sathyanath Sreekumar | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUKUMARAN P K NAIR | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.