TOMA FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the poverty sickness and distress of children and young people, (up to and including 24 years of age) with cancer, aplastic anaemia, Fanconi's anaemia and other associated conditions and their families and carers in the north of England particularly, but not exclusively, those receiving treatment with the Newcastle upon Tyne NHS Foundation Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
- Darlington
- Durham
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 06 June 2011: Standard registration
- 22 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.47k | £197.09k | £118.64k | £132.12k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.75k | £170.97k | £163.68k | £458.49k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 08 August 2019 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 08 August 2019 | 69 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 26 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2017
(These accounts |
26 March 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH CANCER, APLASTIC ANAEMIA, FANCONI'S ANAEMIA AND OTHER ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE RECEIVING TREATMENT WITH THE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window