Financial history WARRANT OFFICER'S & SNCO'S MESS RAF CRANWELL

Charity number: 1141532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £153.04k £48.85k £96.55k £131.37k £138.10k
Total expenditure £156.11k £32.52k £73.63k £138.05k £146.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A