THE CHARLIE MORTIMER FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise the funds by many means; tombola's and cake stalls, auctions and concerts. Friends and family have run several marathons, walked the three peaks and cycled coast to coast! We have hosted BBQ's and coffee mornings. We are a very busy little charity!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 February 2012: Standard registration
- 09 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHARLIE MORTIMER MEMORIAL FUND (Working name)
- CHARLIE'S ANGELS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.78k | £8.25k | £3.48k | £5.19k | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.08k | £366 | £8.51k | £205 | £17.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 24 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 28 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/01/2012
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE METABOLIC DISEASE MCADD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND DISTRIBUTION OF INFORMATION ABOUT THE DISEASE AND PROVIDING SUPPORT AND FINANCE TO OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES UNDERTAKING SIMILAR ACTIVITIES. 2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES AFFECTED BY MCADD (AND OTHER METABOLIC DISEASES), IN PARTICULAR BY NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO REGISTERED CHARITIES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHICH: - PROVIDE SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES, INCLUDING SUPPORT SERVICES FOR CHILD BEREAVEMENT; - PROVIDE MEDICAL CARE TO BABIES AND CHILDREN; AND - PROVIDE SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED IN THE RESEARCH AND TREATMENT OF MCADD (AND OTHER METABOLIC DISEASES).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window