QUETZAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The project's objectives are to provide counselling and emotional support to women in Leicestershire who have experienced sexual abuse and who are in circumstances of need, hardship and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
- QUETZAL (Previous name)
- THE QUETZAL PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Ryley | Chair | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carla Simone Thomas | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Antony Seaman | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Owen | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bushra Ali | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Paula Hurley | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Sophie Ann Wesson | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priya Luharia | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Munden | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fazeela Patel | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.24k | £236.59k | £179.55k | £222.96k | £280.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.52k | £158.25k | £175.57k | £208.47k | £270.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £46.91k | £12.12k | £22.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 22/12/2004 as amended on 30 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE WOMEN IN LEICESTERSHIRE (LEICESTER CITY, LEICESTERSHIRE COUNTY AND RUTLAND) WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED SEXUAL ABUSE AND WHO ARE IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF NEED AND HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, WHERE SUCH PERSONS CAN SECURE BY COUNSELLING AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT TO: A) PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH; B) ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING MENTAL DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14-16 TALBOT LANE
LEICESTER
LE1 4LR
- Phone:
- 03331014280
- Email:
- help@quetzal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window