WILLOW DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To save dogs from Council pounds, have them neutered, vaccinated and microchipped and rehabilitate and rehome them.. To encourage volunteers to walk the dogs in our kennels, for the dogs benefit and the associated health benefits for the volunteers; To provide advice, support and awareness about dog care to anyone who needs it and to promote responsible dog ownership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 27 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE DRABBLE | Chair | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Karlie Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sheppard | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LAYCOCK | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.37k | £24.01k | £22.58k | £8.91k | £456 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.12k | £19.71k | £21.99k | £37.47k | £36.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 May 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN YORKSHIRE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICLUAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE AND OWNERSHIP IN GENERAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Edward Street
Wombwell
Barnsley
S73 0BH
- Phone:
- 01226341387
- Email:
- willowdogrescue@post.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window