DISTINGTON OLD FOLKS REUNION CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Summer outing which includes a coach trip to a pre-determined venue also including a 3 course lunch. 2. Xmas party which includes a 4 course xmas lunch with entertainment and refreshments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 27 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Mason | Trustee | 16 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TIERNEY | Trustee | 23 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
COLIN MCBRIDE | Trustee | 23 March 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.28k | £5.51k | £165 | £3.87k | £5.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £3.79k | £348 | £4.23k | £7.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/12/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF QUALIFYING BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION EACH YEAR (IF FUNDS PERMIT) OF A SUMMER OUTING AND A CHRISTMAS REUNION. BENEFICIARY SHALL MEAN EACH PERSON WHO HAS ATTAINED THE AGE OF SIXTY FIVE (65) OR SIXTY (60) YEARS IN THE CASE OF WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS, AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN DISTINGTON INCLUDING FURNESS ROW, WINDSCALE AVENUE AND LILLYHALL. IN THE CASE OF HUSBAND /WIFE OR PARTNER, SHOULD EITHER HAVE REACHED THE QUALIFYING AGE, BOTH QUALIFY TO ATTEND ANY FUNCTION. IN ORDER TO QUALIFY RESIDENTS MUST HAVE LIVED IN THE STATED DISTRICT ONE MONTH PRIOR TO ANY FUNCTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Central Avenue
Distington
Workington
CA14 5XB
- Phone:
- 01946830170
- Email:
- COWENCHLOE@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
COWENCHLOE@AOL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window