Financial history GREY COURT SCHOOL FARM

Charity number: 1142822
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2013 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017
Total gross income £372 £314 £29.26k £475 £0
Total expenditure £4.44k £6.71k £7.14k £17.82k £25.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0