GRAVESHAM EXCELLENCE CLUSTER LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and educational opportunities of children, young people and families by providing and assisting in the provision of services for schools in Gravesham and other areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 29 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm David Moaby | Chair | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Frazer Edward Westmorland | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Arnold-Jones | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Patricia Duncan | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jackson | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Grattan | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Rorke | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARA NADINE KEMSLEY | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.39k | £112.44k | £84.32k | £73.25k | £61.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.68k | £131.55k | £111.04k | £112.66k | £69.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/02/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND THE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR SCHOOLS IN GRAVESHAM AND IN ANY OTHER AREAS. TO PURSUE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS SET OUT IN S.2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2006, AS AMENDED FROM TIME TO TIME, AS THE CHARITY DIRECTORS MAY THINK FIT, PROVIDED THAT SUCH PUBLIC BENEFIT CAN BE DEMONSTRATED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IFIELD SMILE CENTRE
Ifield School
Cedar Avenue
GRAVESEND
DA12 5JT
- Phone:
- 01474362465
- Email:
- finance@glp-uk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window