A J BELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is organising fund raising events. These events are held for the benefit of various beneficiaries, within the scope of the charity's objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JAMES BELL | Chair | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bernard Barrow | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Desmond Clements | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ANNE BELL | Trustee | 22 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £416.65k | £684.87k | £292.95k | £659.79k | £166.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.55k | £298.54k | £193.25k | £35.09k | £371.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £670.87k | N/A | £622.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £14.00k | N/A | £37.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £298.54k | N/A | £35.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.08k | N/A | £7.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £296.64k | N/A | £26.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, HELP AND RELIEVE PERSONS LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE IN NEED, WHETHER AS A RESULT OF THEIR AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH, LACK OF OPPORTUNITY, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, WITH THE PRIMARY FOCUS BEING ON CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blythe Hall
Blythe Lane
Lathom
Ormskirk
L40 5TY
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- moorhall@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window