STELIOS PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stelios Philanthropic Foundation supports activities in the places where the founder lived and worked:UK,Greece,Cyprus and Monaco. 1.funding scholarships for students 2.supporting entrepreneurship with cash prizes to stimulate economic growth/job creation. 3.donating money to charities 4.operating programme in Greece-Cyprus 'Food from the heart' that offers daily snacks to people in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£16,290,696
Donations and legacies | £16.12m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £169.36k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,455,419
Raising funds | £437.42k | |
Charitable activities | £6.02m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £437.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.02m | |
Retained for future use | £9.84m |
People

4 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cyprus
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Indonesia
- Lebanon
- Monaco
- Romania
- South Africa
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 06 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR STELIOS HAJI-IOANNOU | Chair | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Irene Rouvitha Panou | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Watson | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Donald Michael Manasse | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Claude Louis Eude | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nikolaos Mourkogiannis | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcom Peter Barton DL | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.07m | £6.23m | £1.20k | £10.50m | £16.29m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.03m | £3.68m | £1.70m | £2.92m | £6.46m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.07m | £6.22m | N/A | £10.50m | £16.12m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £12.83k | N/A | £0 | £169.36k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.92m | £3.62m | N/A | £2.59m | £6.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £109.69k | £65.49k | N/A | £327.68k | £437.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £469.34k | £422.41k | N/A | £800.54k | £110.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.44m | £1.68m | N/A | £1.39m | £3.83m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.22m | £16.47m | N/A | £16.48m | £17.61m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £6.54m | £961.57k | N/A | £6.16m | £14.84m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.76m | £1.37m | N/A | £702.40k | £683.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/2011 as amended on 26 Jul 2019 as amended on 10 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO: 3.1 PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR THE DISABLED, PEOPLE IN POVERTY AND DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE, AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; 3.2 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; 3.3 PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 3.4 ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 3.5 DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 3.6 PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONGST PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED BY PROVIDING THEM WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO BUILD CAPACITY BY ESTABLISHING AND GROWING A BUSINESS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; 3.7 PROMOTE NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES; AND 3.8 PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, CYPRUS, GREECE AND MONACO
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Thurloe Square
South Kensington
London
SW7 2SR
- Phone:
- 02080755044
- Email:
- RSVP@STELIOS.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window