Trustees EALING CRICKET CLUB
Charity Number: 1141973

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Robert Francis Stoughton | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregory St John Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shilpa Vinod Bose | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Scott | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Paul Morrey | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mitul Patel | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert George White | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Holt | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penny Louise Lewis | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Grafton | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin William Wheeler | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.