Financial history CHRISTIAN FUND FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1140907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2019 01/11/2020 01/11/2021 01/11/2022 01/11/2023
Total gross income £1.50k £300 £4.60k £274 £9.27k
Total expenditure £3.23k £270 £3.82k £263 £453
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A