JAFFNA HOLY FAMILY CONVENT PAST PUPILS ASSOCIATION UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The members of the charity have raised money in the year through donations, membership fees and fund raising activities to make donations to the Jaffna Family Convent School in Sri Lanka and to students in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 12 August 2011: Standard registration
- JHFCPPA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angelika Priyanthi Worthington | Chair | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emilie Kulaindran | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Suganthy Antonypillai | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benno Raji Kingsley | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malliga Baladasan | Trustee | 12 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Irani Lawrence | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maria Santiapillai | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE IGNATIUS | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR SYBILLA KUMAR MBBS MRCGP DFFP DIPLOMA IN DIABETES | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUBENTHU SAVERIMUTHU | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
VINITHA NOELLA SAVUNDRANAYAGAM | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.66k | £1.87k | £2.73k | £5.89k | £19.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.93k | £5.13k | £1.29k | £9.62k | £10.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2009
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT JAFFNA HOLY FAMILY CONVENT SCHOOL IN SRI LANKA, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: PROVIDING SPONSORSHIP AND SCHOLARSHIPS TO SUPPORT ORPHANS, HANDICAPPED, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND OTHER STUDENTS IN NEED; RAISING FUNDS TO IMPROVE THE LEARNING ENVIRONMENT, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL; AND PROMOTING THE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF TEACHERS AND STAFF THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS LECTURES, COUNSELLING AND OTHER MEANS. (II).THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PAST AND PRESENT PUPILS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 East End Road
LONDON
N3 3QT
- Phone:
- 07941643301
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window