HEBRON EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of the following:- Sunday Christian services with provison for adults and children Mid week housegroup meetings Childrens clubs Mid week daytime meetings Courses for specific groups as required. (e.g. Basic Christianity, divorce care, money matters) Weddings, funerals, adult baptism and dedication services Pastoral care, schools work and community events e.g. , BBQ, "Saturdads"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 24 March 2011: Standard registration
- HEBRON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN CLARE O'DONNELL | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA STOKES | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JANE JENKINS | Trustee | 19 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MICHAEL GOLDING | Trustee | 06 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.14k | £20.44k | £21.90k | £21.06k | £23.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.24k | £45.83k | £15.85k | £29.52k | £35.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2010 as amended on 25 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY WORSHIPPING GOD AND MAKING GOD KNOWN IN THE LONG ASHTON AREA AND BEYOND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hebron Church
8 Providence Lane
Long Ashton
BRISTOL
BS41 9DQ
- Phone:
- 07815891026
- Email:
- info@hebron-church.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window