Governing document HEBRON EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Charity Number: 1140879

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2010 as amended on 25 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY WORSHIPPING GOD AND MAKING GOD KNOWN IN THE LONG ASHTON AREA AND BEYOND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.