FRIENDS OF BIRKENHEAD COUNCIL KENNELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operational running of stray dog kennels facility for the Wirral area. The charity also fundraises and raises awareness of dog welfare issues in the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £92,281 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 26 September 2011: Standard registration
- 10 February 2021: Funds received from 1050723 THE SOCIETY FOR DOGS IN DISTRESS
- FOBCK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martine Catton | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kristie Jacobs | Trustee | 08 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Humphreys | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHIL SIMPSON | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAM SIMPSON | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.87k | £346.78k | £146.04k | £186.79k | £178.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.55k | £177.51k | £190.00k | £209.54k | £206.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £115.33k | £82.60k | £100.86k | £92.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/09/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN KENNELS OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION,CARE AND TREATMENT OF THESE DOGS IN THE WIRRAL AND LIVERPOOL CITY. 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING 'APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION,TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT,POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Metropolitan Borough of Wirral
Animal Control & Welfare Service
The Kennels
Corporation Road
BIRKENHEAD
CH41 4JZ
- Phone:
- 01515561220
- Email:
- office@fobk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window