INTERNATIONAL FORUM FOR RURAL TRANSPORT AND DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The International Forum for Rural Transport and Development (IFRTD) is a global network of individuals and organisations working together towards improved access, mobility and economic opportunity for poor communities in developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Colombia
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Peru
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 25 March 2011: Standard registration
- 08 May 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.99k | £232.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.39k | £291.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/01/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/02/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN THE FIELDS OF RURAL TRANSPORT, ACCESSIBLITY AND MOBILITY IN INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, BY: 1 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN THE FIELD, AND THE DISSEMINATION AND PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF 2 THE PROMOTION OF INFORMATION DISSEMINATION AND NETWORKING; AND 3 RAISING AWARENESS AMONGST PROFESSIONALS, DECISION AND POLICY MAKERS AND SERVICE PROVIDERS AND ASSISTING IN DESIGNING STRATEGIES TO ADDRESS THE ACCESS AND TRANSPORT NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window