BREAD OF HEAVEN INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church have been working with the youth in Enfield borough through evangelism preaching the word of God and to promote good behaviour. We have also been putting up various activities such as gospel concert, football, and seminars. We plan to work with the London Borough of Enfield to raise funds to enable us to put on various projects such as health, and music lessons for youth and elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isaac Osei | Chair | 25 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Francis Prah | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
BYRON DEAN LEWIN | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK MENSAH | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.24k | £149.57k | £161.15k | £185.61k | £166.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.18k | £135.14k | £155.81k | £172.07k | £168.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 April 2022 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 April 2022 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/11/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHBRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 Sterling Way
Edmonton
LONDON
N18 1QU
- Phone:
- 07852720170
- Email:
- breadofheaven@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window