Financial history AFRICAN COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1143218
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/04/2017 28/04/2018 28/04/2019 28/04/2020 28/04/2021
Total gross income £1.24k £931 £11.23k £8.73k £1.34k
Total expenditure £311 £751 £8.73k £7.40k £755
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A