Financial history CROXLEY GREEN U3A

Charity number: 1142144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.70k £5.71k £8.56k £15.78k £34.57k
Total expenditure £16.23k £4.37k £5.94k £18.09k £32.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A