Trustees CROXLEY GREEN U3A
Charity number: 1142144

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Mark Smyth | Chair | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wright | Trustee | 16 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Nigel Collingwood | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Casadei | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bland | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Anne Catherine Williams | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Hankinson | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Windle | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Patricia Limpitlaw Mann | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Peter Taffel | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETE COULSON | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.