Financial history BEAUTY WITH A PURPOSE

Charity number: 1142826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £73.89k £58.99k £16.70k £32.21k £24.05k
Total expenditure £90.80k £48.78k £38.31k £91.62k £23.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A