MILITARY GARDENERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Military Gardeners is a new charity (charity number 1140881) set up to help service personnel readapt to civilian life on leaving the Armed Forces. This can be a difficult transition, particularly for those with a long service history, those who have been injured and those who have suffered from combat stress. Our aim is to raise 6.5 million pounds to fund and train 500 gardeners of the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 2011: Standard registration
- 09 April 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £10.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 08 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 October 2011 | 29 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/01/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO HAVE SERVED IN HM ARMED FORCES BY ADVANCING ANY LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (1) TO PROMOTE THEIR RESETTLEMENT INTO CIVILIAN LIFE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES TO ESTABLISH EMPLOYMENT, OR SELF EMPLOYMENT, OPPORTUNITIES AS GARDENERS OR HORTICULTURISTS; AND (2) TO MAKE GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES WHO ASSIST PERSONS WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE HM ARMED FORCES WITH THE RESETTLEMENT PROCESS.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window