Financial history WOODLANDS QUAKER HOME

Charity number: 1141622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.69m £1.86m £1.90m £1.91m £2.13m
Total expenditure £1.70m £1.86m £1.85m £2.01m £2.09m
Income from government contracts £263.33k £192.08k £261.92k £319.56k £300.74k
Income from government grants N/A £87.52k £80.89k £3.48k £8.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.83k £12.02k £5.14k £9.52k £5.51k
Income - Other trading activities £6.37k £6.32k £6.30k £13.85k £16.67k
Income - Charitable activities £1.66m £1.84m £1.88m £1.88m £2.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.57k £7.35k £12.16k £10.52k £12.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.86m £1.85m £2.01m £2.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.41k £1.55k £1.13k £1.18k £1.05k
Expenditure - Governance £7.70k £7.30k £8.09k £9.56k £17.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.41k £1.55k £1.13k £1.18k £1.05k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0