THE NELSON AND JEAN DANCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pay or apply the income and capital to or for the benefit of any charity or charitable purposes as the trustees shall in their discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY JEAN MATTHEWS | Chair | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAMILTON HUGHES | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE MARY MOODIE | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW VICTOR HUGHES | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12k | £1.38k | £2.59k | £5.61k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.36k | £44.62k | £3.34k | £25.16k | £40.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITY OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o New Quadrant Partners Limited
25 Bury Street
St James's
London
SW1 6AL
- Phone:
- 02074307150
- Email:
- charities@nqpltd.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window