ELIZABETH'S LEGACY OF HOPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with experienced partners on the ground, providing prosthetic support through mobility devices and physiotherapy for vulnerable child amputees in Sierra Leone, Liberia and India. Supporting advocacy and awareness-raising to reduce stigma and prejudice against amputees. Supporting child amputees to gain access to education, assisting their families with livelihood support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
- Liberia
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 11 April 2011: Standard registration
- 23 February 2023: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- ELOFH (Working name)
- ELOH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.05k | £65.52k | £57.15k | £32.36k | £41.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.50k | £35.63k | £46.39k | £57.40k | £83.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/10/2010
Charitable objects
1) TO IMPROVE THE LIVES OF LIMBLESS CHILDREN AND CHILDREN AFFECTED BY LIMB LOSS IN THE UK AND IN LESS DEVELOPED COUNTRIES, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PROSTHETICS, ORTHOTICS AND OTHER TECHNICAL DEVICES TO ASSIST AMPUTEES, REHABILITATION, WIDER SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC SUPPORT WHEN NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 2) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT, CARE, EDUCATION AND LIVELIHOOD SUPPORT FOR LIMBLESS CHILDREN AND CHILDREN AFFECTED BY LIMB LOSS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO PROSTHETICS AND OTHER TECHNICAL DEVICES TO ASSIST AMPUTEES, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS'. 3) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OF LIMBLESS CHILDREN IN LESS DEVELOPED COUNTRIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window