THE ALBERT AND ELIZABETH CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of financial support to charities, societies and institutions in the UK to relieve poverty, the advancement of education, the advancement of religion, the relief of sickness and distress and such other charitable purposes beneficial to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Ann Slora | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|||||
DAVID GERALD SLORA | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|||||
NICK CRONIN | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.14k | £40.90k | £43.59k | £48.18k | £46.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.14k | £138.02k | £124.05k | £104.79k | £61.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2023
(These accounts |
28 August 2024 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2021
(These accounts |
31 March 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CHARITIES, SOCIETIES, INSTITUTIONS OF BODIES OF PERSONS ESTABLISHED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMNENT OF RELIGION, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Maple Close
BROMYARD
HR7 4LQ
- Phone:
- 01885488160
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window