THE SCHUMACHER INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop, find, finance and carry out projects which promote concepts such as convergent action in the form of integrated solutions and strategies To promote the application of critical systems thinking To undertake, promote and assist the undertaking of research, collaboration and facilitation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £4,900 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 2011: Standard registration
- THE SCHUMACHER CENTRE LTD. (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN FELTON RODERICK | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
|||||
BRENDA JANE MCLENNAN | Trustee | 25 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.76k | £220.05k | £157.15k | £118.95k | £128.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.94k | £129.24k | £170.33k | £215.42k | £96.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | £4.90k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 10 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 AUGUST 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE USE OF APPLIED SYSTEMS SCIENCES; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE APPLICATION OF SYSTEMS THINKING, AND THE CONCEPTS OF CONVERGENCE AND INTERDISCIPLINARITY TO SOCIAL AND GLOBAL ISSUES, INCLUDING RESOURCE USE, CLIMATE CHANGE, ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT AND SOCIAL COHESION; C) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: I. THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; II. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; III. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS." D) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Schumacher Institute
Create Centre
Smeaton Road
BRISTOL
BS1 6XN
- Phone:
- 07921970952
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window