Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LLANFRECHFA GRANGE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 501775
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £55 £5.92k £3 £3 £4
Total expenditure £0 £20 £10 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A