Accounts and annual returns NIGERIA MUSLIM FORUM UK (NMF UK)

Charity number: 1144040
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 February 2024 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required