Trustees CHRISTIANS ACROSS WATFORD
Charity Number: 1143977

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadya Dyett | Chair | 11 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon John William Heard | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neal Anthony Sparks | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Embree | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Penny | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Knell | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kola Siyanbola | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aaron McGovern | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.